WA HB1267 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the time period for voter registration. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Concerning voter registration. )
Title
Extending the time period for voter registration. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Concerning voter registration. )
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-27 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2014-01-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 59; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-01-20 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2013-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 64; nays, 33; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-07 | House | Floor amendment |
2013-03-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-14 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-12 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-12 | House | GOE - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-12 | House | GOE - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2013-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5268 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.