WA HB1261 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing receiving care centers for emergency and crisis care for children removed from their homes.
Title
Establishing receiving care centers for emergency and crisis care for children removed from their homes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | House | Effective date 7/28/2013. |
2013-05-01 | House | Chapter 105, 2013 Laws. |
2013-05-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-04-23 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2013-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-06 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-02-20 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-15 | House | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-15 | House | ELHS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services. |