WA HB1257 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Effective date 7/1/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Effective date 7/1/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopting the investments of insurers model act.
Title
Adopting the investments of insurers model act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Effective date 7/1/2012. | |
2011-04-29 | Chapter 188, 2011 Laws PV. | |
2011-04-29 | Governor partially vetoed. | |
2011-04-19 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-18 | President signed. | |
2011-04-18 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-14 | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-04-14 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2011-04-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2011-04-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-11 | Floor amendment | |
2011-04-11 | Committee amendment not adopted. | |
2011-04-08 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-31 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-17 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-17 | FIHI - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2011-03-16 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-15 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-08 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. | |
2011-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-05 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-03-03 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2011-01-28 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-01-25 | BFS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-01-25 | BFS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-01-25 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-21 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-18 | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5121 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.