WA HB1253 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the timeline for commencing basic law enforcement training.
Title
Concerning the timeline for commencing basic law enforcement training.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-01-31 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5944 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1253&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1253.pdf |