WA HB1250 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Designating Washington a purple heart state.
Title
Designating Washington a purple heart state.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Sen. Matt Boehnke [R] | Rep. Jeremie Dufault [R] |
Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-10 | House | Chapter 213, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-10 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2021-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-09 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-19 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-01-28 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 40 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 60a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |