WA HB1250 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing retail marijuana outlets to give a free lockable drug box to adults age twenty-one years and over and to qualifying patients age eighteen years and over subject to restrictions.
Title
Authorizing retail marijuana outlets to give a free lockable drug box to adults age twenty-one years and over and to qualifying patients age eighteen years and over subject to restrictions.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Sen. Drew MacEwen [R] |
Rep. Dave Hayes [R] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] | Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-04-27 | House | Chapter 131, 2017 Laws. |
2017-04-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-20 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | CLS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |
2017-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-14 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-01-30 | House | COG - Majority; do pass. |
2017-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming |