WA HB1244 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning appraisal management company Title XI compliance and license expiration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning appraisal management company Title XI compliance and license expiration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-02-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2019-02-14HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-02-14HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-14House1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-05HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-01-23HouseCPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-01-23HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-17HouseFirst reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback