WA HB1227 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting the rights of families responding to allegations of abuse or neglect of a child.
Title
Protecting the rights of families responding to allegations of abuse or neglect of a child.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Committee on Children, Youth & Families: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Committee on Children, Youth & Families: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021*. |
2021-05-10 | House | Chapter 211, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-10 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 87; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-04-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2021-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-04 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-03-04 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-16 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-16 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-01-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-01-27 | House | CYF - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-01-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Children, Youth & Families. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 34 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 34 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 34 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 34 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 34 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 34 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 44 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 44 | 056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |