WA HB1223 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date 7/25/2021*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date 7/25/2021*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the uniform electronic recordation of custodial interrogations act.
Title
Enacting the uniform electronic recordation of custodial interrogations act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate, on Reconsideration (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass with amendment(s) by Law & Justice (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate, on Reconsideration (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass with amendment(s) by Law & Justice (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021*. |
2021-05-18 | House | Chapter 329, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Vote on third reading will be reconsidered. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | And refer to Transportation. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2021-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-22 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 2:30 PM. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2021-02-12 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-12 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-12 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-11 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
9 | 73 | 030 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |