WA HB1221 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Standardizing homelessness definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Standardizing homelessness definitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Committee on Children, Youth & Families: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16HouseEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-04-16HouseChapter 67, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-16HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-13HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-09SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-19SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-18SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-03-18SenateHSRR - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-18SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-16SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-25SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
2021-02-23HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-02-23HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-23House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-17HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-01-29HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-01-27HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-01-27HouseCYF - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-27HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-25HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Children, Youth & Families.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1334030Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1334065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1334138Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2644020Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43216505Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1221&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1221.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1221-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1221-S.SL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1221-S.PL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1221-S%20AMH%20DENT%20BROD%20052.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1221%20HBA%20CYF%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1221%20HBR%20CYF%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1221-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1221-S%20SBA%20HSRR%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1221-S%20SBR%20HSRR%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1221-S%20SBR%20HSRR%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1221-S%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1221-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123488&actionText=CYF%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28372&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123488&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-23-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1221&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123488&actionText=HSRR%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28835&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123488&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-05-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1221&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback