WA HB1219 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Effective date 7/6/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Effective date 7/6/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing expedited permitting and contracting for Washington state bridges deemed structurally deficient.
Title
Authorizing expedited permitting and contracting for Washington state bridges deemed structurally deficient.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | Effective date 7/6/2015. |
2015-07-06 | House | Chapter 10, 2015 Laws 3rd Special Session. |
2015-07-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-06-30 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2015-06-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-29 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-02 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-02 | House | TR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |