WA HB1205 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Transportation.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Transportation.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a right of first repurchase for surplus transportation property.
Title
Providing a right of first repurchase for surplus transportation property.
Sponsors
Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. David Taylor [R] | Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] |
Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-23 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1205&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1205.pdf |