WA HB1204 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adding two district court judges in Benton county.
Title
Adding two district court judges in Benton county.
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Bradley Klippert [R] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] |
Rep. Brendan Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2010-01-11 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-02-25 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-02-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-02-23 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-01-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-01-22 | JUDI - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-01-22 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-01-22 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-15 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5102 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-13 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1204&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1204.pdf |