WA HB1203 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning community oversight boards.
Title
Concerning community oversight boards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Public Safety (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-18 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-18 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-18 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Public Safety. |
2021-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-02-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-04 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
Subjects
LAW ENFORCEMENT AND LAW ENFORCEMENT PERSONNEL
SHERIFFS AND POLICE CHIEFS, WASHINGTON ASSOCIATION OF (WASPC)
SHERIFFS AND POLICE CHIEFS, WASHINGTON ASSOCIATION OF (WASPC)