WA HB1194 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthening parent-child visitation during child welfare proceedings.
Title
Strengthening parent-child visitation during child welfare proceedings.
Sponsors
Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Melanie Morgan [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Kirsten Harris-Talley [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Committee on Children, Youth & Families: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Committee on Children, Youth & Families: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-10 | House | Chapter 208, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-10 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-04-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2021-02-25 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-02-25 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-16 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-16 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-16 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-01-27 | House | CYF - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-01-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Children, Youth & Families. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 34 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 34 | 067 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 34 | 136 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 34 | 138 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |