WA HB1191 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-7)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing incentives to support renewable solar energy.
Title
Providing incentives to support renewable solar energy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-01-28 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology and Energy & Communications at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-14 | First reading, referred to Technology, Energy & Communications. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1191&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1191.pdf |