WA HB1174 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying the contracting procedures for cities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifying the contracting procedures for cities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21HouseHouse Rules "X" file.
2020-01-13HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-06HouseLG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Local Government.

Same As/Similar To

SB5225 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback