WA HB1172 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning beer and wine tasting at farmers markets.
Title
Concerning beer and wine tasting at farmers markets.
Sponsors
Rep. Frederick Finn [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Rep. Phyllis Kenney [D] | Rep. Marcie Maxwell [D] |
Rep. Chris Reykdal [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. David Upthegrove [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-04-14 | Chapter 62, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-04-14 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-08 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-07 | President signed. | |
2011-04-06 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 37; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-04-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-31 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-28 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-23 | LCCP - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-22 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-05 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. | |
2011-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-03 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-02-22 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. | |
2011-02-07 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-02 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-02 | SGTA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-02 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-02 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-13 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. |