CA SB1253 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-08-15 - August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-08-15 - August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 31615 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: firearm safety certificates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1253 Gonzalez (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1253 Gonzalez (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-15 | Assembly | August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-06-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 11). |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 4104.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3977.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3450.) (April 2). |
2024-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 31615 | Amended Code | Citation Text |