WA HB1171 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Business & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Business & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning expiration dates related to real estate broker provisions.
Title
Concerning expiration dates related to real estate broker provisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Susan Fagan [R] |
Rep. Linda Kochmar [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Business & Financial Services. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-23 | House | GGIT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 9:00 AM. |
2015-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to Gen Govt & Info Tech. |
2015-01-21 | House | BFS - Majority; do pass. |
2015-01-21 | House | BFS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-01-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
SB5288 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Effective date 7/24/2015.