WA HB1171 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changing Washington beer commission provisions.
Title
Changing Washington beer commission provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources. | |
2010-01-11 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-04-09 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-23 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-03-23 | LCCP - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-19 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-25 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. | |
2009-02-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-02-23 | Placed on third reading. | |
2009-02-23 | Committee recommendations adopted. | |
2009-02-19 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-16 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-12 | AGNR - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-12 | AGNR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-12 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-05 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-14 | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1171&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1171.pdf |