WA HB1164 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a competitive equipment assistance grant program to enhance student nutrition in public schools.
Title
Creating a competitive equipment assistance grant program to enhance student nutrition in public schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-10 | House | CB - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1164&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1164.pdf |