WA HB1158 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Granting local governments the authority to make challenges related to growth management planning subject to direct review in superior court.
Title
Granting local governments the authority to make challenges related to growth management planning subject to direct review in superior court.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1158&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1158.pdf |