WA HB1158 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Local Government.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Local Government.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the annexation of property owned by the state for military purposes.
Title
Concerning the annexation of property owned by the state for military purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Tami Green [D] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Rep. David Sawyer [D] |
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Local Government. |
2014-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2013-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-09 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-25 | House | APPG - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-25 | House | APPG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology at 9:00 AM. |
2013-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology at 3:30 PM. |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government. |
2013-01-31 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-01-31 | House | LG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5068 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.