WA HB1158 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing electronic signatures on juror questionnaires. (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: ) (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: Allowing electronic signatures on juror declarations. )
Title
Allowing electronic signatures on juror questionnaires. (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: ) (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: Allowing electronic signatures on juror declarations. )
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Bradley Klippert [R] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] |
Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-05-05 | Chapter 330, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-05 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-23 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-22 | President signed. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-18 | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-18 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2009-04-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2009-04-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-03 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on second reading consent calendar. | |
2009-03-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-25 | JUD - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-20 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-25 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-02-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-02-23 | Placed on third reading. | |
2009-02-23 | Committee recommendations adopted. | |
2009-02-19 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2009-01-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-01-22 | JUDI - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-01-22 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-01-22 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-14 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5134 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.