WA HB1139 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the methods of services provided by the office of public guardianship.
Title
Concerning the methods of services provided by the office of public guardianship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2017-02-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-02-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-01-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-01-26 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass. |
2017-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB5447 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.