WA HB1132 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning oversight and training requirements for limited authority Washington peace officers and agencies.
Title
Concerning oversight and training requirements for limited authority Washington peace officers and agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Skyler Rude [R] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] |
Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-04-25 | House | Chapter 168, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 6:00 PM. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2023-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-01 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-23 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry. |
2023-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-02-09 | House | CSJR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry. |
2023-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 101 | 010 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 101 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 101 | 200 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 101 | 276 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 101 | 278 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |