WA HB1130 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning water power license fees.
Title
Concerning water power license fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] |
Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 80 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-03-31 | House | Chapter 75, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 80; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | EET - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
2016-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 71; nays, 27; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-16 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-15 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-05 | House | GGIT - Majority; do pass ENVI 16 bill proposed by Environment. |
2016-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 3:30 PM. |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred to General Government & Information Technology. |
2016-01-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-01-19 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-01-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |