WA HB1123 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating the minimum dimensions of habitable spaces in single-family residential areas.
Title
Regulating the minimum dimensions of habitable spaces in single-family residential areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-26 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-28 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | GOS - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |
2015-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-05 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-02 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-02 | House | CDHT - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |