WA HB1122 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Technology, Energy and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Technology, Energy and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding the department of information services' authority to provide services to public agencies.
Title
Regarding the department of information services' authority to provide services to public agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Technology, Energy & Communications. | |
2012-01-12 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-04 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-02-04 | TEC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-04 | TEC - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-04 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology and Energy & Communications at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-25 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology and Energy & Communications at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-12 | First reading, referred to Technology, Energy & Communications. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5009 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.