WA HB1117 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting salmon recovery through revisions to the state's comprehensive planning framework.
Title
Promoting salmon recovery through revisions to the state's comprehensive planning framework.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 13 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 13 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | HLG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
2022-01-26 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-25 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | HLG - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
2021-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-03-02 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-22 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2021-02-17 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-02-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-04 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-02 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 70a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 70a | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | 070 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
90 | 58 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
90 | 74 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |