WA HB1117 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing health care services balance billing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing health care services balance billing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-01-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness

Same As/Similar To

SB5619 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback