WA HB1114 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging utility mitigation of urban heat island effects.
Title
Encouraging utility mitigation of urban heat island effects.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Dye [R] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-07 | House | Chapter 11, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-05 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-03-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2021-02-25 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-12 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-09 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-02 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 92 | 355 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 92 | 390 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
54 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
54 | 16 | 400 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 28 | 260 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 28 | 300 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |