WA HB1113 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amending state greenhouse gas emission limits for consistency with the most recent assessment of climate change science and with the United States' commitment under the 2015 Paris climate agreement.
Title
Amending state greenhouse gas emission limits for consistency with the most recent assessment of climate change science and with the United States' commitment under the 2015 Paris climate agreement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-01-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-01-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-01-31 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2019-01-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |