WA HB1113 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning gradually increasing the local government share of excess liquor revenues until the percentage-based method for distributions is restored.
Title
Concerning gradually increasing the local government share of excess liquor revenues until the percentage-based method for distributions is restored.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-09 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-09 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-09 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |