WA HB1108 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the definition of rape in the third degree and indecent liberties.
Title
Modifying the definition of rape in the third degree and indecent liberties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-15 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | House | Effective date 7/28/2013. |
2013-05-01 | House | Chapter 94, 2013 Laws. |
2013-05-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-04-23 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 5:30 PM. |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2013-03-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-03-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-02-18 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-13 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-13 | House | PS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-07 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |