WA HB1102 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning judge pro tempore compensation.
Title
Concerning judge pro tempore compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-04-06 | House | Chapter 24, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-03-31 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-03-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2023-01-25 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-01-25 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-01-24 | House | Placed on second reading suspension calendar. |
2023-01-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2023-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-01-13 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2023-01-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2023-01-03 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |