WA HB1099 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain wages in public works contracts to be at least the prevailing wage in effect when the work is performed.
Title
Requiring certain wages in public works contracts to be at least the prevailing wage in effect when the work is performed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-20 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-24 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2023-01-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-01-20 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2023-01-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2022-12-30 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |