WA HB1095 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the administration of marijuana to students for medical purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the administration of marijuana to students for medical purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-04-30HouseChapter 204, 2019 Laws.
2019-04-30HouseGovernor signed.
2019-04-26HouseDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-25SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-23HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-18HousePassed final passage; yeas, 79; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2019-04-13SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-04-13SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-13SenateCommittee amendment
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-04-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-04-01SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-04-01SenateEDU - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-27SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2019-03-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-12House1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-09HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-02-05HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-01HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-01HouseHCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-01HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-30HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-25HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2019-01-09HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB5442 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-21 - First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1095&year=2019
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1095.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1095-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1095-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1095-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117155&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-12-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1095&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117155&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-13-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1095&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117155&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-18-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1095&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback