WA HB1090 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Effective date 4/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning private, for-profit detention facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning private, for-profit detention facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: do pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseEffective date 4/14/2021.
2021-04-14HouseChapter 30, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-14HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-08HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-05SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-03-30SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-03-30SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-19SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-17SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-16SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-16SenateHSRR - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-16SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-11SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-25SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
2021-02-23HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 76; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-02-23HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-23HouseFloor amendment
2021-02-17HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-01-28HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-01-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-01-28HousePS - Majority; do pass.
2021-01-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety.
2021-01-05HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
70New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1090&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1090.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1090.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1090.SL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1090.PL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1090%20AMH%20ORTI%20LEON%20642.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1090%20AMH%20GRAH%20LEON%20672.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1090%20AMH%20KLIP%20LEON%20667.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1090%20AMH%20KLIP%20LEON%20669.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1090%20AMH%20MOSB%20LEON%20668.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1090%20HBA%20PS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1090%20HBR%20PS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1090.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1090.E%20SBA%20HSRR%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1090.E%20SBR%20HSRR%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1090.E%20SBR%20HSRR%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1090.E%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1090.E%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1090.E%20HBR%20FBR%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123163&actionText=PS%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28378&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123163&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-23-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1090&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123163&actionText=HSRR%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28834&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123163&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-30-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1090&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback