WA HB1086 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House General Government Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House General Government Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain providers of electric service to purchase electricity from eligible distributed generators.
Title
Requiring certain providers of electric service to purchase electricity from eligible distributed generators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to General Government Appropriations. | |
2009-02-18 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-02-18 | TEC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-18 | TEC - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-18 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology and Energy & Communications at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-28 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology and Energy & Communications at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Technology, Energy & Communications. | |
2009-01-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |