WA HB1076 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing whistleblowers to bring actions on behalf of the state for violations of workplace protections.
Title
Allowing whistleblowers to bring actions on behalf of the state for violations of workplace protections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-25 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | LCTA - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 9:30 AM. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |
2021-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-05 | House | Amendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill. |
2021-03-05 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-05 | House | Not adopted; yeas, 41; nays, 57; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-05 | House | Motion to recommit to the committee on Local Government |
2021-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-22 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2021-02-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-05 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2021-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
DISCRIMINATION
EMPLOYMENT AND EMPLOYEES
LABOR
LABOR AND INDUSTRIES, DEPARTMENT
NAMED ACTS
PUBLIC EMPLOYMENT AND EMPLOYEES
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
WAGES AND HOURS
EMPLOYMENT AND EMPLOYEES
LABOR
LABOR AND INDUSTRIES, DEPARTMENT
NAMED ACTS
PUBLIC EMPLOYMENT AND EMPLOYEES
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
WAGES AND HOURS
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | New Code | See Bill Text |