WA HB1071 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Regarding state and private partnerships for managing salmonid hatcheries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding state and private partnerships for managing salmonid hatcheries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-01HouseEffective date 7/28/2013.
2013-05-01HouseChapter 93, 2013 Laws.
2013-05-01HouseGovernor signed.
2013-04-23HouseDelivered to Governor.
2013-04-19SenatePresident signed.
2013-04-18HouseSpeaker signed.
2013-04-17SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2013-04-17SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2013-04-15SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2013-03-27SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2013-03-26SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2013-03-26SenateNRP - Majority; do pass.
2013-03-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2013-03-14SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2013-03-08SenateFirst reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks.
2013-03-06HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2013-03-06HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2013-03-06House1st substitute bill substituted
2013-03-05HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2013-02-08HousePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2013-02-07HouseAGNR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2013-02-07HouseAGNR - Executive action taken by committee.
2013-02-07HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM.
2013-01-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM.
2013-01-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

SB5543 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback