WA HB1052 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-25 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-25 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning firearm licenses for persons from other countries.
Title
Concerning firearm licenses for persons from other countries.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Rep. Joel Kretz [R] | Rep. Jim Moeller [D] |
Rep. Brendan Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-07 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-25 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-25 | Chapter 216, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-25 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-20 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-19 | President signed. | |
2009-04-18 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-16 | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-16 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2009-04-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2009-04-07 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-07 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-30 | JUD - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-27 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-24 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-05 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-03 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-19 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-17 | APPG - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-17 | APPG - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-17 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-10 | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-02 | Referred to General Government Appropriations. | |
2009-01-29 | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-01-29 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-01-29 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-15 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-12-30 | Prefiled for introduction. |