WA HB1049 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Updating timelines for adopting county commissioner district boundaries following expansion from three to five commissioners.
Title
Updating timelines for adopting county commissioner district boundaries following expansion from three to five commissioners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-05-04 | House | Chapter 237, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-13 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | LGLT - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs. |
2023-02-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-02-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-01-31 | House | Placed on second reading suspension calendar. |
2023-01-31 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2023-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-01-13 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2023-01-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2022-12-19 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5106 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.