WA SB5106 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Updating timelines for adopting county commissioner district boundaries following expansion from three to five commissioners.
Title
Updating timelines for adopting county commissioner district boundaries following expansion from three to five commissioners.
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2023-02-09 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | LGLT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs. |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1049 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2023.