WA HB1049 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the off-site delivery of a vehicle by a vehicle dealer licensed under chapter 46.70 RCW.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the off-site delivery of a vehicle by a vehicle dealer licensed under chapter 46.70 RCW.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass with amendment(s) by Business, Financial Services & Trade (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10HouseEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-05-10HouseChapter 201, 2021 Laws.
2021-05-10HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-20HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-19SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-14HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-13HousePassed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-13HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2021-04-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-10SenateCommittee amendment
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-04-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-04-02SenateTRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-04-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM.
2021-03-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-17SenateOn motion, referred to Transportation.
2021-03-16SenateBFST - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-03-16SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-11SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-29SenateFirst reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade.
2021-01-27HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2021-01-27HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-01-27HouseFloor amendment
2021-01-22HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-01-14HouseCPB - Majority; do pass.
2021-01-14HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-13HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business.
2020-12-23HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19118031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4670023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6314040Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6314154Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1049&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1049.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1049.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1049.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1049.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1049%20AMH%20KIRB%20BURZ%20001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1049.E%20AMS%20BFST%20S2084.1.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1049%20HBA%20CPB%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1049%20HBR%20CPB%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1049.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1049.E%20SBA%20BFST%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1049.E%20SBR%20BFST%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1049.E%20SBR%20BFST%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1049.E%20SBA%20TRAN%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1049.E%20SBR%20TRAN%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1049.E%20SBR%20TRAN%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1049.E%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1049.E%20HBR%20SA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1049.E%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123090&actionText=CPB%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28210&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123090&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=01-27-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1049&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123090&actionText=BFST%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=28696&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123090&actionText=TRAN%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29%20by%20Business%2C%20Financial%20Services%20%26amp%3B%20Trade.&mId=28989&isInit=False&bie
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123090&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-10-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1049&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123090&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-13-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1049&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback