WA HB1049 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM
Pending: House Civil Rights & Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Jan 18 @ 10:00 am in House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning health care provider and health care facility whistleblower protections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning health care provider and health care facility whistleblower protections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-18HouseScheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM
2019-01-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
2018-12-14HousePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback