WA HB1046 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Effective date 1/1/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Effective date 1/1/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning vehicle and vessel quick title.
Title
Concerning vehicle and vessel quick title.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-21 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Effective date 1/1/2012. | |
2011-05-12 | Chapter 326, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-05-12 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-22 | President signed. | |
2011-04-22 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-21 | Passed final passage; yeas, 70; nays, 26; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2011-04-21 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2011-04-20 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-04-20 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-20 | Floor amendment | |
2011-04-20 | Returned to second reading for amendment. | |
2011-04-20 | Rules suspended. | |
2011-04-20 | Senate receded from amendments. | |
2011-04-13 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. | |
2011-04-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-04-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-09 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2011-04-08 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-31 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-24 | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2011-03-23 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-03-21 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-03-08 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2011-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-05 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-25 | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. | |
2011-02-04 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-01-31 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-01-31 | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-01-31 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-01-31 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-01-12 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-01-10 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2011-01-03 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5038 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.