WA HB1044 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Delivered to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creating prison to postsecondary education pathways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating prison to postsecondary education pathways.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Committee on College & Workforce Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-21SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-20HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-14HousePassed final passage; yeas, 59; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2021-04-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2021-04-09SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-04-09SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-09SenateCommittee amendment
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-29SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-27SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-03-27SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-27SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-03-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2021-03-23SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2021-03-17SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-03-16SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-03-16SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-03-16SenateHSRR - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-03-16SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-11SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-01SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
2021-02-25HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-25HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-25House2nd substitute bill substituted
2021-02-23HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-16HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-16HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-16HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-11HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-01-25HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-01-25HouseCWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-25HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to College & Workforce Development.
2020-12-22HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28b15067Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7209New CodeSee Bill Text
7209270Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7209460Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7209465Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7268New CodeSee Bill Text
7268010Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1044&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1044.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1044-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1044-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1044-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1044-S2.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1044-S2%20AMS%20HSRR%20S2055.2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1044-S2%20AMS%20DARN%20S2402.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1044-S2%20AMS%20PADD%20S2339.2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1044-S2%20AMS%20RIVE%20S2340.2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1044-S2%20AMS%20RIVE%20S2748.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1044-S2%20AMS%20WAGO%20S2338.2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1044-S2%20AMS%20ENGR%20S2055.E.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1044%20HBA%20CWD%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1044%20HBR%20CWD%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1044%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1044-S2%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1044-S2%20SBA%20HSRR%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1044-S2%20SBR%20HSRR%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1044-S2%20SBR%20HSRR%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1044-S2%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1044-S2%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1044-S2%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1044-S2%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1044-S2%20HBR%20SA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1044-S2%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123078&actionText=CWD%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28418&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123078&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28617&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123078&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-25-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1044&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123078&actionText=HSRR%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=28834&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123078&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29%20by%20Human%20Services%2C%20Reentry%20%26amp%3B%20Rehabilitation.&mId=28969&isInit=False&b
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123078&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-09-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1044&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123078&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-14-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1044&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback